Billings, David John (CPSO#: 74772)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Jan 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
66 Albert Street South
Southampton ON  N0H 2L0
Phone: (519) 483-6000
Fax: (519) 483-6001
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Saugeen Memorial Hospital
340 High Street
Southampton ON  N0H 2L0
Canada
Phone: (519) 797-3230
County: County of Bruce
Electoral District: 03

Breakwater Laser Medical
66 Albert Street
Southampton ON  N0H 2L0
Canada
Phone: (519) 797-3007
Fax: (519) 797-2450
County: County of Bruce
Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton
Grey Bruce Health Services,Wiarton Site Wiarton
Hanover and District Hospital Hanover

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID JOHN BILLINGS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BILLINGS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2003