Bilotta, Rosetta (CPSO#: 72602)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2000

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 24
9200 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4H 2P8
Phone: (647) 986-4357
Fax: (416) 913-4357
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Bilotta Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bilotta ( CPSO# 72602 )

Business Address:
LAMP Occupational Health Centre
185 Fifth Street
Etobicoke ON  M8V 2Z5
Phone Number: (416) 252-9701

Business Address:
24 - 9200 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4H 2P8
Phone Number: (647) 986-4357

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROSETTA BILOTTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BILOTTA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2000

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: February 21, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
Download Full Document (PDF)