Bilston, Anne Elizabeth (CPSO#: 89854)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal Free Hospital School of Medicine, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Highland Park Medical Clinic Suite 2B 6315 Horn Street Red Deer AB T4N 6H5
Date Received: 11 May 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta
United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016