Bilyk, Steven Bohdan (CPSO#: 24185)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ukrainian

Education:University of Toronto, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 08 Nov 2012

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Jun 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 1971
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2010