Bin, James Chung-Yau (CPSO#: 84091)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
Department of Medical Oncology
Suite K-304, 650 Sammon Ave
Toronto ON  M4C 5M5
Phone: (416) 469-3325
Fax: (416) 469-8221
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: James Bin Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Bin ( CPSO# 84091 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
Department of Medical Oncology
Suite K-304 650 Sammon Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5M5
Phone Number: (416) 469-3325

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES CHUNG-YAU BIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 13 Mar 2006 to 09 Apr 2006
Elective Trainee - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Apr 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2009