Bin Mahfooz, Ali A A (CPSO#: 69745)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Saud University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 10 Jan 1996 to 09 Jan 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 10 Jan 1997 to 09 Jan 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 10 Jan 1998 to 09 Jan 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 10 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jan 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002