BinSaleh, Saleh Abdulrahman (CPSO#: 83252)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 06 Feb 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Feb 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007