Bingham, John Lee (CPSO#: 32098)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Sep 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 07 Jul 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
One St. Clair Avenue West
suite 404
Toronto ON  M4V 1K6
Phone: (416) 924-0777
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1981 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1980
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 06 Jun 2003
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 06 Sep 2003
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 07 Jul 2017

Pending Discipline Hearings

Summary: Dr. John Lee Bingham (June 7, 2017) Allegations of Dr. Bingham’s professional misconduct have been referred to the Discipline Committee of the College. It is alleged that Dr. Bingham engaged in the sexual abuse of Patient A and/or in disgraceful, dishonorable or unprofessional conduct by, among other things, inappropriate and/or sexual comments to Patient A and inappropriate, sexual and/or physical contact with Patient A.

Notice of Hearing: Download Full Notice (PDF)

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 07 Jul 2017 Active View Details [+]
            As from 12:01 a.m., July 7, 2017, by order of the Inquiries, Complaints and
            Reports Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, the
            following terms, conditions and limitations are imposed on the certificate of
            registration held by Dr. John Lee Bingham:

            Practice Monitor and Patient Log

            (i)   Dr. Bingham shall not engage in any professional encounter, in person or
                  otherwise (the "Professional Encounter") with patients of any age in any
                  jurisdiction, unless the Professional Encounter takes place in the
                  continuous presence of and under the continuous observation of a monitor
                  who is a regulated health professional acceptable to the College (the
                  "Practice Monitor"), and unless the other requirements provided in this
                  Order are fulfilled. For further clarity, Dr. Bingham may not be alone
                  with any patient, for any length of time, during any Professional
                  Encounter, whether or not the parent or guardian of the patient is also
                  present. 

            (ii)  At all times, Dr. Bingham shall ensure that the Practice Monitor shall:

                  (a)   Provide reports (as described in the Practice Monitor's
                        undertaking) to the College on at least a monthly basis; 
                  
                  (b)   Remain present at all times during all Professional Encounters with
                        all patients;
                  (c)   Carefully observe all of Dr. Bingham's Professional Encounters with
                        patients including, but not limited to, physical and internal
                        examinations.  It is Dr. Bingham's obligation to ensure that the
                        Practice Monitor's view of all of his Professional Encounters with
                        patients, including physical and internal examinations, is
                        unobstructed at all times;  
                  
                  (d)   Refrain from performing other functions, except those required in
                        the Practice Monitor's undertaking attached as Appendix "B", while
                        observing Dr. Bingham in all his Professional Encounters with
                        patients;
                  
                  (e)   Maintain a log of all Professional Encounters with patients in the
                        form attached as Appendix "C" (the "Log");
                  
                  (f)   Initial all corresponding entries in the records of patients noted
                        in the Log; and
                  
                  (g)   Submit the original Log to the College on a monthly basis.
                  
            (iii) Dr. Bingham shall maintain a copy of the Log at all times, and shall make
                  it available to the College upon request.

            Notification of Practice Locations

            (iv)  Dr. Bingham shall inform the College of each and every location that he
                  practices or has privileges including, but not limited to, hospital(s),
                  clinic(s) and office(s), in any jurisdiction (collectively the "Practice
                  Location(s)"), within five (5) days of this Order.  Going forward, he
                  shall inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within
                  five (5) days of commencing practice at that location;

            Posting a Sign and Translations

            (v)   Dr. Bingham shall post a sign in all waiting rooms, examination rooms and
                  consulting rooms, in all of his Practice Locations, in a clearly visible
                  and secure location, in the form attached hereto as Appendix "D" that
                  states: "Dr. John Lee Bingham must not have professional encounters, in
                  person or otherwise, with patients, of any age, unless in the continuous
                  presence of and under the continuous observation of a practice monitor
                  acceptable to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario. Dr.
                  Bingham must not be alone during any professional encounter with any
                  patient. Further information may be found on the College website at
                  www.cpso.on.ca." 

            (vi)  Dr. Bingham shall post a certified translation(s) in any language(s) in
                  which he provides services, of the sign described in (v) above, in all
                  waiting rooms, examination rooms and consulting rooms, in all of his
                  Practice Locations, in a clearly visible and secure location, in the form
                  attached hereto as Appendix "D".

            (vii) Dr. Bingham shall provide the certified translation(s) described in (vi)
                  above to the College within 30 days of the date of this Order;

            Notifying Patients

            (viii)Dr. Bingham shall ensure that each patient with whom he has a
                  Professional Encounter is directly notified, prior to the Professional
                  Encounter, of the details of the restriction described in (i), above. 

            (ix)  With respect to patients that are scheduled at least seven (7) days in
                  advance, Dr. Bingham shall ensure that each patient is directly notified,
                  within seven (7) days after the appointment is scheduled, of the details
                  of the restriction described in (i) above.

            Monitoring

            (x)   Dr. Bingham shall consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of
                  the Ontario Health Insurance Plan and/or any person or institution who
                  may have relevant information in order for the College to monitor Dr.
                  Bingham's compliance with the terms of this Order and shall promptly sign
                  such consents as may be necessary for the College to obtain information
                  from these persons or institutions;

            (xi)  Dr. Bingham shall submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced
                  inspections of his Practice Locations and to inspections of patient
                  charts by the College and to any other activity the College deems
                  necessary in order to monitor Dr. Bingham's compliance with the terms of
                  this Order;

            (xii) Dr. Bingham shall consent to the College providing any and all
                  information to the Practice Monitor that the College deems necessary or
                  desirable in order to assist the Practice Monitor in fulfilling their
                  Undertaking and in order to monitor Dr. Bingham's compliance with the
                  terms of this Order;

            (xiii) Dr. Bingham shall consent to all Practice Monitors to disclose to the
                  College, and to one another, any information relevant to this Order,
                  relevant to the terms of the Practice Monitor's Undertaking and/or
                  relevant for the purposes of monitoring Dr. Bingham's compliance with
                  this Order; and

            (xiv) Dr. Bingham shall consent to the College providing the Order to any
                  Chief(s) of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any
                  Practice Location where he practices or has privileges ("Chief(s) of
                  Staff"), and to provide said Chief(s) of Staff with any information the
                  College has that led to this Order and/or any information arising from
                  the monitoring of his compliance with this Order.

Previous Discipline Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 06 Jun 2003
Summary:

 On June 6, 2003, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. John Lee Bingham committed an act of 
 professional misconduct under clause 1(1)33 of O/Reg. 856/93, in that he engaged in an act or 
 omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would 
 reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

The Discipline 
 Committee ordered and directed that:

1.	The Registrar shall forthwith suspend Dr. Bingham(s 
 certificate of registration for a period of six (6) months.  The Registrar shall suspend three (3) 
 months of this suspension on the following conditions:

(i)	that Dr. Bingham has successfully 
 completed a course on boundaries acceptable to the College.

(ii)	Dr. Bingham will post security 
 by way of letter of credit in the amount of $10,000.00, to guarantee the payment of any amount the 
 College may pay out in respect of funding for therapy and counselling.

2.	Dr. Bingham is to pay 
 costs to the College in the amount of $2,500.00 prior to the completion of the suspension.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 06, 2003