Bingham, John Mckenney (CPSO#: 17671)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 10 Nov 1964 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1960
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 1966
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 1967
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010