Binkley, Gerald Alan (CPSO#: 57234)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Aug 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Aug 1999


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 21 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Aug 1999