Binkley, Karen Ellen (CPSO#: 56034)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1986


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 204
30 St Clair Avenue West
Toronto ON  M4V 3A1
Phone: (416) 968-7010
Electoral District: 10


Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 17 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology Effective: 30 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. KAREN ELLEN BINKLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BINKLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 5 - Clinical Immunology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1986