Binnie, Phyllis Alexandra (CPSO#: 87285)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Harvard Medical School, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone: (416) 494-2120
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: 416 530 6602
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alexandra Binnie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 01 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Binnie ( CPSO# 87285 )

Business Address:
William Osler Health System
Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 494-2120

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Portugal

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 28 Feb 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PHYLLIS ALEXANDRA BINNIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BINNIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2010 to 31 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 28 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2012