Binnington, Melanie Elizabeth (CPSO#: 56726)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jun 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
The Mississauga Hospital site
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 07 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELANIE ELIZABETH BINNINGTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BINNINGTON is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Jun 1986 to 15 Jun 1987
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1987