Birbrager, Donna Rae (CPSO#: 58027)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Aug 1988

Summary

Former Name: Goldman, Donna Rae (used until: 22 Dec 1988 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone: (905) 721-4064
Fax: (905) 721-4061
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
Lakeridge Health,Whitby Site Whitby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 02 Sep 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONNA RAE BIRBRAGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIRBRAGER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1987 to 13 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1988