Birch, Sandra Elizabeth (CPSO#: 33572)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Jul 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jul 1982

Summary

Former Name: Rayner, Sandra Elizabeth (used until: 22 Mar 1988 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address
Special Services Unit
90 John Street South
Stratford, Ontario
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y8
Phone: (519) 274-8288
Fax: (519) 272-8226
Electoral District: 02

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SANDRA ELIZABETH BIRCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIRCH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1982
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1982