Birchard, James David (CPSO#: 53864)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Dec 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
274 Dundas Street East
Suite 201
Belleville ON  K8N 1E6
Phone: (613) 969-8087
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. David Birchard Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 24 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Birchard ( CPSO# 53864 )

Business Address:
201 - 274 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 1E6
Phone Number: (613) 969-8087

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES DAVID BIRCHARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIRCHARD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1985