Birchenough, James William (CPSO#: 70144)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
550 California Street
Suite 625
San Francisco CA  94104
United States
Phone: (415) 591-2129

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JAMES WILLIAM BIRCHENOUGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIRCHENOUGH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 1999
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 13 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2015