Birchwood, Barbara Lauris (CPSO#: 17845)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, German

Education:State University of Leiden, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 01 Dec 1969 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 1961
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 1961
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2012