Bird, Charles Edward (CPSO#: 15803)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1956

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 1961 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1956
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jan 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1965
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1997