Bird, Gordon Samuel (CPSO#: 15095)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2003

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1954

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 09 Nov 1959 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1999 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1999 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 1955
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2003