Birdsell, Dale Campbell (CPSO#: 46967)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 20 Oct 1990

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 1961
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Jul 1962
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 09 Oct 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Oct 1990