Birk, Patricia Elizabeth (CPSO#: 71929)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 19 Aug 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 19 Aug 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 06 Sep 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Sep 1997
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 07 Sep 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Sep 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2000
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 19 Aug 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2000