Birnie, Stuart Alistair (CPSO#: 54367)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P.O. Box 1105
Erin ON  N0B1T0
Phone: 416-559-6785
Fax: 519-833-7136
Electoral District: 03

Medical Records Location

Address: DOCUdavit Medical Solutions - 28 Eugene Street, Toronto ON M6Z 3Z4 Tel: 1-888-781-9083
Date Received: 10 Apr 2015

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Headwaters Health Care Centre,Orangeville-Dufferin Site Orangeville

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STUART ALISTAIR BIRNIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIRNIE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1991
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 1991
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1992
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1992