Biro, George Peter (CPSO#: 19324)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1963
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Oct 1964
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 24 Nov 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 1974
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2007