Biro, Laurence Steven (CPSO#: 91218)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Centre Mississauga
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Laurence Biro Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Biro ( CPSO# 91218 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre Mississauga
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton
South Bruce Grey Health Centre,Chesley Site Chesley
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jul 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAURENCE STEVEN BIRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIRO is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 02 Apr 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2011