Birse, Sheila Hamilton (CPSO#: 16418)

Current Status: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 14 Aug 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Aug 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Edinburgh, 1952

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Pathology Effective: 14 Nov 1960 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1957
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Aug 1970
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 1999
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 14 Aug 2009