Birt, Brian Derek (CPSO#: 32131)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 27 Jun 2006

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 27 Jun 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1957

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 1970
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Dec 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Oct 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jun 2006