Birt, Catherine Mary (CPSO#: 60820)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Aug 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Science Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
M1-302A
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-5882
Fax: (416) 480-4481
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

340 College Street
Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5T3A9
Canada
Phone: 4169282132
Fax: 4169286607
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: C.M. Birt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 29 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Birt ( CPSO# 60820 )

Business Address:
600 - 350 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Phone Number: (416) 978-7931

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Hospital
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room M1 302A
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-5882

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 12 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE MARY BIRT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIRT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1990