Birtwhistle, Richard Vernon (CPSO#: 27238)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Apr 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Apr 1975

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
220 Bagot St
Kingston ON  K7L5E9
Phone: 613 533 9303 Ext. 73934
Fax: 613 533 9302
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard Birtwhistle Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Birtwhistle ( CPSO# 27238 )

Business Address:
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Phone Number: (613) 533-9303

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD VERNON BIRTWHISTLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BIRTWHISTLE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1973
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jun 1974
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Apr 1975