Bischoff, Markus Matthias (CPSO#: 70064)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:McMaster University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 104
450 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 8T2
Phone: (905) 864-9921
Fax: (905) 864-8003
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bischoff Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 11 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Bischoff ( CPSO# 70064 )

Business Address:
Suite 104
450 Bronte Street South
Milton ON  L9T 8T2
Phone Number: (905) 864-9921

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARKUS MATTHIAS BISCHOFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BISCHOFF is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001