Biscotti, Marilena (CPSO#: 60839)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: Biscotti-Credico, Marilena (used until: 13 Sep 1998 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lincoln Medical Centre
4413 Ontario Street
Beamsville ON  L0R 1B5
Phone: (905) 563-1212
Fax: (905) 563-4404
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marilena Biscotti Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Biscotti ( CPSO# 60839 )

Business Address:
Lincoln Medical Centre
4413 Ontario Street
Beamsville ON  L0R 1B5
Phone Number: (905) 563-1212

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Nov 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARILENA BISCOTTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BISCOTTI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Jun 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1990