Bishara, Laila Daoud (CPSO#: 71266)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:Ain Shams University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
6633 Hwy 7 E
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone: (905) 201-1429
Fax: (905) 201-4956
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Laila Bishara Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 02 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Bishara ( CPSO# 71266 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
6633 Highway 7 East
Markham ON  L3P 7P2
Phone Number: (905) 201-1429

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 12 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LAILA DAOUD BISHARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BISHARA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001