Bishara, Mona Roshdy Youssif (CPSO#: 85033)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Department of General Pathology
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 2543
Fax: (519) 749-4221
Electoral District: 03
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

200 Terrace hill street
Brantford ON  N3R1G9
Canada
Phone: (519) 751-5544
County: County of Brant
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONA ROSHDY YOUSSIF BISHARA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BISHARA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 08 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - General Pathology

McMaster University, 09 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010