Bishop, Karen Lisa (CPSO#: 82132)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of the West Indies, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 16 Mar 2005
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 17 Mar 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Mar 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2005