Bishop, Kelly Ann (CPSO#: 109149)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: Postgraduate Education as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: Fernandes, Kelly Ann (used until: 24 Jan 2017 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queen's Family Health Team
Department of Family Medicine
220 Bagot Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5E9
Phone: (613) 533-9300
Electoral District: 06

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KELLY ANN BISHOP shall practise medicine only as required by the postgraduate medical education program in which Dr. BISHOP is enrolled at QUEEN'S UNIVERSITY;

(2) Dr. BISHOP shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. BISHOP is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. BISHOP shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earlier of the following times: when Dr. BISHOP is no longer enrolled in a program of postgraduate medical education provided by a medical school in Ontario, or when Dr. BISHOP no longer holds Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada).

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2018