Bishop, Monica Anne (CPSO#: 66386)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Nov 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Nov 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospice Renfrew
459 Albert Street
Renfrew ON  K7V 1V8
Phone: 613-433-3993
Fax: 613-432-3618
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Joseph's Hospice London
485 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5M2
Canada
Phone: 519-931-3479
Fax: 519-931-3488
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist
FCFP - Family Medicine Effective: 04 Nov 2006 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MONICA ANNE BISHOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BISHOP is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 May 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 27 Nov 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 27 May 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2015