Biskupska, Klaudia (CPSO#: 102053)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 29 Sep 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Poznan University of Medical Sciences, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Oct 2015 CFPC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 30 Sep 2013 to 22 Dec 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 29 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 30 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 29 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Sep 2015