Bismil, Ramprasad (CPSO#: 84945)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Malayalam

Education:University of Pune, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Psychiatry
TBRHSC
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: 807 684 6425
Fax: 807 684 5870
Electoral District: 09
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Department of Psychiatry
The Ottawa hospital Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: 613 761 4588
Fax: 613 761 4177
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. R. Bismil Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 08 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Bismil ( CPSO# 84945 )

Business Address:
Department of Psychiatry
The Ottawa Hospital - Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAMPRASAD BISMIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BISMIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010