Bismilla, Fasel Abdul Hay (CPSO#: 27839)

Current Status: Active Member as of 18 Sep 1975

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 25 Jun 2015

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Groves Memorial Hospital
235 Union St E
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3
Phone: (519) 843-2010
Fax: (519) 843-7288
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fasel Bismilla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Bismilla ( CPSO# 27839 )

Business Address:
Groves Memorial Hospital
235 Union Street East
Fergus ON  N1M 1W3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Groves Memorial Community Hospital,Fergus Fergus

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Jun 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 25 Jun 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 25 Jun 2015 Active View Details [+]

            As from June 25, 2015, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Fasel Abdul Hay
            Bismilla, in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Bismilla
            to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  Dr. Bismilla must not engage in the practice of family medicine.