Bisset, John Glen Villiers (CPSO#: 14297)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 15 Sep 1992

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Glasgow, 1951

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 23 Nov 1962 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 1953
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1959
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Nov 1980
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 15 Sep 1992