Bissett, Randall John (CPSO#: 50162)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 11 Sep 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 11 Sep 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: R.J. Bissett Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 5 2014

Medical Records Location

Address: 41 Ramsey Lake Road Sudbury, ON P3E 5J1
Date Received: 11 Sep 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 02 Dec 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 11 Sep 2015