Bissonnette, Melanie (CPSO#: 88590)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jan 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jan 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Clarence Rockland Family
Health Team
2741 Chamberland Rd
Rockland ON  K4K 0B4
Phone: (613) 446-7677
Fax: (613) 446-5737
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jan 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELANIE BISSONNETTE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BISSONNETTE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 11 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 12 Jan 2010 to 11 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 12 Jan 2011 to 17 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jan 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2011