Biswas, Abhijit (CPSO#: 104504)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2017

Expiry Date:  15 May 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Aug 2017

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calcutta, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abhijit Biswas Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Biswas ( CPSO# 104504)

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
Department of Anesthesia
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
LHSC Victoria Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
26 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 646-6100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

India
Ireland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Aug 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 03 Sep 2014
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Aug 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 May 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Aug 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Abhijit Biswas may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Anaesthesia  and  Perioperative  Medicine,  University  of  Western
                        Ontario,  in which Dr. Biswas holds an academic appointment at  the
                        rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of  registration  automatically  expires seven years from
                  the  date  of issuance or when Dr. Biswas no longer  holds  the  academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate  of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the  Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives  a report indicating that Dr. Biswas' clinical
                        performance, knowledge,  skill,  judgment, professional conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee does not receive an  annual  report  or  receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the  Committee  makes a decision about Dr. Biswas' certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on  August  1,  2017,  and  currently  has  an
                  interim expiry date of May 15, 2020.  The expiry date of this certificate
                  may be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.