Biswas, Debashis (CPSO#: 87722)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 16 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 16 Sep 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of London, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Sep 2007 to 16 Nov 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 17 Nov 2007 to 16 Sep 2008
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 16 Sep 2008