Biswas, Kevin Shawn Sunil (CPSO#: 106169)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
South Windsor Medical Center
Suite 2
3840 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N9E 3N9
Phone: (519) 969-3744
Fax: (519) 969-4478
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
Phone: (519) 973-4411
Fax: (519) 973-4897
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Suite 101
13278 Tecumseh Road East
Tecumseh ON  N8N 3T6
Canada
Phone: (519) 979-5260
Fax: (519) 979-8085
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN SHAWN SUNIL BISWAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BISWAS is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2017