Bitnun, Sean (CPSO#: 71254)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Paediatrics
The Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-7654 Ext. 206268
Fax: (416) 813-8404
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Infectious Diseases Effective: 14 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SEAN BITNUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BITNUN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Infectious Diseases

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004