Bittira, Bindu (CPSO#: 81466)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Kannada

Education:Dalhousie University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Sciences North
865 Regent Street South
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Y9
Phone: (705) 671-5353
Fax: (705) 671-5352
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bittira MacDonald Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Bittira ( CPSO# 81466 )
Dr. D. MacDonald ( CPSO# 83351 )

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
Memorial Site
M131 - 865 Regent Street South
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Y9
Phone Number: (705) 671-5353

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BINDU BITTIRA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BITTIRA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004