Bjornson, Candice Leigh (CPSO#: 68033)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Alberta, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 27 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997