Black, Amanda Yvonne (CPSO#: 69881)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 81799
Fax: (613) 738-8505
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Shirley Greenberg Women's
Health Centre
Riverside Campus 7th Floor
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Canada
Phone: (613) 738-8400 Ext. 81739
Fax: (613) 738-8505
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Black and Lapner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 04 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Black ( CPSO# 69881 )
Dr. P. Lapner ( CPSO# 70602 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Box 502, W 1648
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8377

Business Address:
Shirley Greenberg Women's
Health Centre
Riverside Campus 7th Floor
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9

Business Address:
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1

Business Address:
2675 Concession Road
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Phone Number: (613) 258-6133

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AMANDA YVONNE BLACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLACK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001