Black, Barbara April (CPSO#: 57391)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Aug 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 1987

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5025 Sherbrooke Street West
Suite 225
Montreal QC  H4A 1S9
Phone: (514) 482-6465
Fax: (514) 482-3380

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BARBARA APRIL BLACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BLACK is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1987